IL HB2767 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that minimum in-service training requirements, which a police officer must satisfactorily complete every 3 years, shall include mental health awareness and response as reflected in the Illinois Mental Health First Aid Training Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POLICE TRAINING-MENTAL HEALTH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
2019-04-30SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-04-10HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2019-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 016-000-000
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
507057Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback