IL HB2769 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Crime and Traffic Assessment Act. Provides that an additional assessment of $100 shall be imposed upon any person who pleads guilty, is convicted of, or who receives a disposition of court supervision for, a sex offense or an attempted sex offense. Provides that the funds shall be deposited in the State Crime Laboratory Fund to pay for the costs of processing and analyzing the Illinois State Police Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits under the Sexual Assault Evidence Submission Act to assist in reduction of the number of unanalyzed and unprocessed Kits. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Defines "sex offense".
Title
SEXUAL ASSAULT-ASSESSMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 135 | 15-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 135 | 15-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-9-1.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2769&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2769.htm |