IL HB2776 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Provides that the rates and minimum mandated wage increases for homemaker services shall be, at a minimum, as of January 1, 2019, a rate of $19.96 per hour, for a minimum wage of $12 per hour, and as of July 1, 2019, a rate of $21.64 per hour for a minimum wage of $13 per hour. Provides that rates in future State fiscal years shall be no lower than the rates in effect on July 1, 2019. Provides that in-home service provider agencies shall be required to certify to the Department on Aging that they are in compliance with the mandated wage increase for direct service workers. Provides that fringe benefits, including, but not limited to, any paid time off, payment for training, health insurance, travel, or transportation payment, shall not be reduced in relation to these rate increases. Effective immediately.
Title
AGING-HOMEMAKER SERVICES-WAGES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-22 | House | To Wages & Rates Subcommittee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |