IL HB2810 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that a unit of local government or school district with an operating budget of $1,000,000 or more shall maintain a website and post to its website for the current calendar or fiscal year specified information. Provides that the information required to be posted must be easily accessible from the unit of local government's or school district's website home page and searchable. Provides penalties for noncompliance. Provides that no home rule unit may adopt posting requirements that are less restrictive than those provided in the Act. Provides that all local records required to be posted shall remain posted on the entity's website, or subsequent websites, for 10 years. Exempts the School District of the Department of Juvenile Justice. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides an exemption from inspection and copying of any record or information that a unit of local government or school district maintains an electronic copy of on its website to comply with the Open Meetings Act. Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that within 6 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Illinois Transparency and Accountability Portal shall have the capability to compile and update its database with information received from all school districts and units of local government. Authorizes the Illinois Transparency and Accountability Portal to provide direct access to information compiled under specified provisions of the Open Meetings Act. Provides an exempt mandate provision. Provides a severability clause. Effective immediately.
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-26 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Re-assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 1.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |