IL HB2812 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to employ an investigator who is required to devote at least 50% of his or her time to the investigation of complaints that allege a violation of the Illinois Optometric Practice Act of 1987 or its rules.
Title
DFPR-OPTOMETRIC INVESTIGATOR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |