IL HB2814 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to require managed care organizations (MCOs) to ensure: (1) that any provider under contract with an MCO on the date of service shall be paid for any medically necessary service rendered to any of the MCO's enrollees, regardless of inclusion on the MCO's published and publicly available roster of available providers; (2) that all contracted providers are listed on an updated roster within 7 days of entering into a contract with the MCO; and (3) that the roster under item (2) is readily accessible by all medical assistance enrollees for purposes of selecting an approved healthcare provider. Requires the Department to require MCOs to expedite payments to providers based on specified criteria (rather than providing that the Department may establish a process for MCOs to expedite payments to providers based on criteria established by the Department). Contains provisions concerning discharge notifications and facility placements and other matters. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-MANAGED CARE PAYMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-20 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-06 | House | To Medicaid Subcommittee |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-30.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-30.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2814&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2814.htm |