IL HB2818 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Address Confidentiality for Victims of Domestic Violence Act. Provides that a person who is a victim of, among other things, sexual assault or stalking may apply for the address confidentiality program under the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ATTY GEN-CONFIDENTIAL ADDRESS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-17HouseArrived in House
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2019-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-05-02SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2019-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7506115Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback