IL HB2822 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0068
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0068
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that the State Board of Education's school report cards must include the most current data on the percentage of students who participated in job shadowing, the percentage of students who have completed an internship, and whether a school offered its students vocational training opportunities. Makes a related change for the State report card. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
SCH CD-SCHOOL REPORT CARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0068 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-09 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-14 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-11 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-11 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-002-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-17a | Amended Code | Citation Text |