IL HB2832 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0208
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Provides that the month of April of each year is designated as Sikh Awareness and Appreciation Month to be observed throughout the State as a month to recognize the many ways that Sikh Americans have influenced American history, achievement, culture, and innovation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SIKH AWARENESS MONTH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-05HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0208
2019-08-05HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-05HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019
2019-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-000-000
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-05-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-07SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
2019-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2019-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54908New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback