IL HB2838 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-23 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-23 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act. Provides that, for contracts entered into on or after July 1, 2019, a direct contractor making or taking a contract in the State for the erection, construction, alteration, or repair of a building, structure, or other private work shall assume, and is liable for, any debt owed to a wage claimant or third party on the wage claimant's behalf, incurred by a subcontractor at any tier acting under, by, or for the direct contractor for the wage claimant's performance of labor included in the subject of the contract between the direct contractor and the owner. Provides for enforcement by the Department of Labor. Provides authorization for third parties owed fringe or other benefits or a joint labor-management cooperation committee to bring a civil action to enforce liability against a direct contractor. Provides exemptions for work done by an employee of the State or any political subdivision of the State. Provides requirements and guidelines for notice, awards, filing, and records retention. Provides that the new provisions are severable, and that the obligations and remedies provided are in addition to any obligations and remedies otherwise provided by law. Provides that nothing the Section shall alter specified obligations and penalties set forth in the State Prompt Payment Act. Effective immediately.
Title
WAGE PAYMENT-DIRECT CONTRACTOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-041-001 |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-010-000 |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |