IL HB2841 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Provides that a marriage may be solemnized by a mayor or president of a city, village, or incorporated town who is in office on the date of the solemnization. Effective immediately.
Title
IMDMA-SOLEMNIZATION-MAYORS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0014 |
2019-06-14 | House | Effective Date June 14, 2019 |
2019-06-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-001-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-009-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-03-06 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-03-06 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | House | To Family Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 5 | 209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |