IL HB2846 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In provisions concerning treatment for pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute onset neuropsychiatric syndrome, provides that treatment administered or prescribed after July 18, 2017 shall be covered. Provides that for billing and diagnosis purposes, pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute onset neuropsychiatric syndrome shall be coded as autoimmune encephalitis until a code is assigned. Provides that coverage for treatment of pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute onset neuropsychiatric syndrome may not be denied due to a diagnosis of autoimmune encephalopathy or autoimmune encephalitis. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AUTOIMMUNE ENCEPHALITIS CODING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 116-000-000
2019-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
2019-05-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2019-05-23HouseArrived in House
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Fine
2019-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 017-000-000
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2019
2019-05-20SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2019-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateDo Pass Insurance; 018-000-000
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-05-01SenatePostponed - Insurance
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-04-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Insurance
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-03-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-05HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 021-000-000
2019-03-05HouseReported Back To Insurance Committee;
2019-03-05HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Insurance Committee; 003-000-000
2019-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-02-28HouseTo Health Insurance Subcommittee
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Insurance Committee
2019-02-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155356z.25Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback