IL HB2847 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-8)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-8)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the introduced bill, as amended by House Amendment 1, with the following changes: Removes provisions amending the Illinois Vehicle Code. Amends the Illinois Anatomical Gift Act. Requires the Secretary of State to create a database consisting of all individuals who have consented to having their names included in the First Person Consent organ and tissue donor registry who have consented to having their names included in the First Person Consent organ and tissue donor registry. Provides what shall be included in the database and requires the Secretary of State to update the database not less than every 7 days. Allows an organ procurement organization that has executed a data access agreement with the Secretary of State to have online access to the database to determine whether a potential organ and tissue donor is included in the First Person Consent organ and tissue donor registry. Requires the organ procurement organization to indemnify and hold harmless the State, its officials, and employees for certain costs arising out of the organ procurement organization's use of the database. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
ORGAN DONOR PROTECTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0179 |
2019-08-01 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-01 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2019-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 021-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported Back To Insurance Committee; |
2019-03-12 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Insurance Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-28 | House | To Special Subcommittee (INS) |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 155.46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 327 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-117 | Amended Code | Citation Text |