IL HB2852 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various acts relating to the governance of public universities in Illinois. Provides that if a university offers a competency-based learning program, it must notify a student if he or she becomes eligible for the program.
Title
HIGHER ED-COMPETENCY LEARNING
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Sen. Celina Villanueva [D] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] |
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0271 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-205 | New Code | See Bill Text |