IL HB2855 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Requires the Illinois Commerce Commission to initiate a process whereby the Commission shall develop a forward-looking plan for strategically increasing transportation electrification in the State, that the process shall be open and transparent, and that the process shall conclude within 270 days of opening. Provides that the plan developed by the Commission shall incentivize transportation electrification through beneficial electrification programs, may include specific directives for public utilities in the State that enable transportation electrification or beneficial electrification, and should specifically address environmental justice interests and provide opportunities for residents and businesses in environmental justice communities to directly benefit from transportation electrification. Effective immediately.
Title
BENEFICIAL ELECTRIFICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported Back To Public Utilities Committee; |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Public Utilities Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-06 | House | To Renewable Initiatives Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |