IL HB2856 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0490
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0490
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2021, the (1) creation, distribution, and receipt of certificates, certifications, affidavits, applications, assignments, statements, notices, documents, and other records; (2) use of signatures; (3) delivery of records; and (4) payment of required fees shall be made in electronic form as those functions relate to the implementation and ongoing management and administration of an electronic lien and title system to process the electronic notation and release of security interests in motor vehicles. Provides that the Secretary of State may charge a fee of up to $1 for each electronic notation and release of security interest. Provides that the Secretary may contract with a private contractor to facilitate the electronic processes. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2021, the Secretary shall (instead of "may") require a licensee to submit any record required to be submitted to the Secretary using electronic media deemed feasible by the Secretary and that electronic submittal, receipt, and delivery of records and electronic signatures shall be supported by a signed agreement between the Secretary and the submitter. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2021, the Secretary shall provide electronic notification and perfection of the lienholder's security interest in a vehicle on the certificate of title. Deletes language requiring that a request for electronic notification and perfection be made by a lienholder submitter. Effective immediately.
Title
TRANSPORTATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0490 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-04-10 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-26 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Re-assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |