IL HB2857 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Vehicle Franchise Act. Provides that it is a violation of the Act to sell a new motor vehicle directly to a retail customer other than through a franchised motor vehicle dealer. Provides that the Act shall not prohibit the ownership or operation of up to 13 places of business in this State by a manufacturer that: (i) has at least one facility in this State that provides repair service for vehicles subject to the manufacturer's warranty; (ii) does not have a franchise agreement with a new motor vehicle dealer operating in this State; and (iii) was granted a new vehicle dealer's license at any time before January 1, 2018 and the new vehicle dealer's license is in effect as of January 1, 2018. Provides conditions to the exception. Effective immediately.
Title
VEHICLE FRANCHISE-NEW CARS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 710 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2857&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2857.htm |