IL HB2868 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to develop a work-based learning database to help facilitate relationships between school districts and businesses and expand work-based learning in this State; defines "work-based learning". Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-WORK-BASED LEARNING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0389 |
2019-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-001-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 015-000-000 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-039-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-18 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-14 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-11 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-11 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 013-003-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |