IL HB2884 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that if an employee was in the service of more than one employer described in provisions concerning certain educational employers, then the sick leave days from all such employers, except for employers from which the employee terminated service before the effective date of the amendatory Act, shall be credited, as long as the creditable service attributed to those sick leave days does not exceed 12 months. Corrects a cross-reference. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-CHI TEACHERS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0492 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 110-005-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Government Accountability and Ethics; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-004-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 17-116.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-116.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-116.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-116.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-116.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-119.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |