IL HB2896 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0273
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Creates the Diversity in Health Care Professions Task Force. Provides that the Director of Public Health shall serve as the chairperson of the Task Force and it shall also be comprised of 2 dentists, 2 medical doctors, 2 nurses, 2 optometrists, 2 pharmacists, 2 physician assistants, 2 podiatrists, and 2 public health practitioners. Provides specified objectives. Provides specified recommendations to serve as guiding principles for the Task Force. Provides that Task Force members shall serve without compensation but may be reimbursed for their expenses incurred in performing their duties. Provides that the Task Force shall meet at least quarterly and at other times as called by the chairperson. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall provide administrative and other support to the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall prepare a report that summarizes its work and makes recommendations resulting from its study and shall submit the report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2020 and annually thereafter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDPH-DIVERSITY TASK FORCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0273
2019-08-09HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-09HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateDo Pass Public Health; 009-000-000
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-14SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-08SenatePostponed - Public Health
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-30SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-004-000
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-02-14HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023102310-213New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback