IL HB2897 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0070
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0070
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department shall investigate and apply for federal funding opportunities, including, but not limited to, a specified federal grant, to support maternal mental health, to the extent that programs are financed, in whole, by federal funds. Provides that the Department shall file a report with the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2021 of the Department's efforts to secure and utilize the federal funding it receives from its efforts. Provides that the amendatory Act's provisions are repealed on January 1, 2022.
Title
IDPH-FEDERAL FUNDING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0070 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Mental Health Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-21 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-21 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |