IL HB2900 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act if and only if Senate Bill 1 of the 101st General Assembly becomes law. Provides that a withholding tax credit for full-time equivalent employees created in Senate Bill 1 applies for reporting periods that begin on or after January 1, 2020 (in the bill, reporting periods that begin on or after January 1, 2020 and end on or before December 31, 2027). Provides that the maximum credit is determined by the Metropolitan and Nonmetropolitan area of the State that is the base of operations of the employee, as those areas are determined as of May 2017. Makes changes concerning the amount of the credit based on the Metropolitan and Nonmetropolitan area of the State. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-WITHHOLDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-08-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-07-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-07-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-07-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-02-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 704A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2900&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2900.htm |