IL HB2924 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Capital Development Board Act. Provides that the Capital Development Board shall require all museums, zoos, and aquariums located in a park district with a population of over 500,000 and all institutions that receive funding from the Horse Racing Fund to submit an annual report on all procurement goals and actual spending for female-owned, minority-owned, and veteran-owned enterprises in the previous calendar year. Provides that the Capital Development Board shall hold an annual workshop open to the public on the state of supplier diversity. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CDB-BUSINESS REPORT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-07-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-07-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-07-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Postponed - State Government
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - State Government
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2019
2019-05-21SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2019-05-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-27HouseReported Back To State Government Administration Committee;
2019-03-27HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ State Government Administration Committee; 003-000-000
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2019-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-13HouseTo Government Process Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20310520New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback