IL HB2935 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that counsel appointed for the minor and any indigent party shall appear at all stages of the trial court proceeding, and the appointment shall continue through the permanency hearings and termination of parental rights proceedings subject to withdrawal, vacating of appointment, or substitution.
Title
JUV CT-APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Morgan [D] | Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0147 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-06 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-03-06 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | House | To Family Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |