IL HB2936 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois False Claims Act. Creates the State Whistleblower Reward and Protection Fund as a fund to be held outside of the State Treasury with the State Treasurer as custodian. Creates the Attorney General Whistleblower Reward and Protection Fund and the State Police Whistleblower Reward and Protection Fund as special funds in the State Treasury. Provides for the allocation of specified amounts, regardless of appropriation, from the State Whistleblower Reward and Protection Fund into the Attorney General Whistleblower Reward and Protection Fund and the State Police Whistleblower Reward and Protection Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to provide for the Attorney General Whistleblower Reward and Protection Fund and the State Police Whistleblower Reward and Protection Fund. Repeals the Whistleblower Reward and Protection Fund as a special fund in the State Treasury. Amends the Public Corruption Profit Forfeiture Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCE-WHISTLEBLOWER FUNDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-26HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0148
2019-07-26HouseEffective Date July 26, 2019
2019-07-26HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000
2019-03-21HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2019-03-21HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2019-03-06HouseTo Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.317Repealed CodeCitation Text
301055.891New CodeSee Bill Text
301055.893New CodeSee Bill Text
528310Amended CodeCitation Text
7401758Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback