IL HB2938 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that Forensic toxicological laboratories shall be established in the State as needed (rather than in Springfield, Chicago, and elsewhere in the State as needed). Repeals a Cyber Gang Unit pilot program created in the Lake County Metropolitan Enforcement Group and the Cook County Sheriff's Office. Repeals provision in the Higher Education Student Assistance Act concerning a forensic science grant program. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a parole agent or parole supervisor shall purchase an off-duty firearm at his or her own expense and shall register the firearm with any local law enforcement agencies that require registration (rather than the Department of State Police with any other local law enforcement agencies that require such registration). Repeals the Methamphetamine Manufacturer Registry Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ST POLICE-DUTIES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11094765.80Repealed CodeCitation Text
2026052605-40Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-580Repealed CodeCitation Text
20260555a-4Amended CodeCitation Text
730180ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
73053-14-1.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback