IL HB2946 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Pedestrians with Disabilities Safety Act. Provides that the Governor is authorized and requested to discuss the history of persons with disabilities in the State and to discuss any violation of the Act or other laws protecting persons with disabilities in his requested yearly proclamation taking public notice of Pedestrians with Disabilities Safety Day. Provides that the proclamation, if issued, shall be displayed on the Governor's website and may be distributed by the Governor on social media.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOV: SAFETY DAY PROCLAMATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019
2019-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Transportation; 013-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Transportation
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-002-000
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6256020Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback