IL HB2950 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Makes the following changes with respect to the homestead exemption for veterans with disabilities: (1) provides that the exemption shall be prorated if the property is first used as a qualified residence by a veteran with a disability after January 1 of a taxable year; and (2) makes changes to the definition of "surviving spouse" to include the surviving spouse of a veteran who did not obtain an exemption before death, but who applied for a service-connected disability certification from the United States Department of Veterans Affairs or the United States Department of Defense no earlier than January 1, 2007 and would have qualified for the exemption under this Section in the current taxable year if he or she had survived. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SURVIVING SPOUSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2950&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2950.htm |