IL HB2956 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Removes language exempting retail customers of an electric utility that serves more than 3,000,000 retail customers in the State and whose total highest 30-minute demand was more than 10,000 kilowatts and retail customers of an electric utility that serves less than 3,000,000 retail customers but more than 500,000 retail customers in the State and whose total highest 15-minute demand was more than 10,000 kilowatts from certain provisions concerning energy efficiency and demand-response measures. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES-ENERGY EFFICIENCY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-06 | House | To Renewable Initiatives Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 8-103B | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2956&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2956.htm |