IL HB2959 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for each taxpayer (i) whose federal adjusted gross income is less than 185% of the federal poverty level and (ii) who is the custodian of a child who attends a high quality early childhood education program during the taxable year. Provides that the term "high quality early childhood education program" means a program that is rated in the Gold Circle of Quality or the Silver Circle of Quality under the ExceleRate Illinois rating system. Creates an income tax credit for a business that (i) provides an early childhood program that is rated in the Gold Circle of Quality or the Silver Circle of Quality under the ExceleRate Illinois rating system and (ii) enrolls a student for at least 6 months during the taxable year who (A) is eligible for the child care assistance program, (B) receives foster care services, or (C) both (A) and (B). Creates an income tax credit for employees of a licensed day care center, day care home, or group day care home who obtain certain certifications. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-EARLY CHILDHOOD CREDITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading (Corrected) |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 229 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 230 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 231 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2959&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2959.htm |