IL HB2965 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Establishes the fiscal year 2020 mileage reimbursement rate and allowance for lodging and meals. Amends the Compensation Review Act. Prohibits cost-of-living adjustments for or during the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2019 for State government legislative and executive elected officers and appointees in positions for which the Compensation Review Board previously recommended or determined compensation. Effective immediately.
Title
GA-PER DIEM & COLAS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 115 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 120 | 6.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2965&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2965.htm |