IL HB2967 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code and Fire Protection District Act. Removes a requirement that 10 years' experience must be at the fire department from which the appointment is being made if a person is appointed fire chief for more than 180 days. Provides that a person not meeting any of the 4 specified qualifications for a fire chief may be hired as fire chief for up to one year on the condition that the person obtain one of the applicable certifications within one year of appointment. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
FIRE CHIEF QUALIFICATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | To Local Government Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 10-1-7.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-2.1-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 705 | 16.04b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2967&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2967.htm |