IL HB2974 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that a taxpayer who is a family caregiver is eligible to receive a nonrefundable income tax credit in an amount equal to 100% of the eligible expenditures incurred by the taxpayer during the taxable year related to the care of an eligible family member, but not exceed $1,500 for the same eligible family member. Provides that the term "eligible family member" means a person who: (1) is at least 18 years of age during a taxable year; (2) requires assistance with at least one activity of daily living; (3) is a resident of the State; and (4) is related to the family caregiver. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INCOME TAX-CAREGIVER CREDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-03-21HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-07HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2019-03-06HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2019-03-06HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2019-03-06HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-03-05HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2019-03-05HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2019-03-04HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2019-03-04HouseJudicial Note Filed
2019-03-04HousePension Note Filed
2019-03-01HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-02-20HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355229New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback