IL HB2979 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Removes provisions from the Illinois Fire Protection Training Act and Fire Protection District Act. In the provisions in the Illinois Municipal Code, limits the provisions to municipalities with a population over 1,000,000 and prohibits requiring a firefighter or firefighter trainee from carrying fire protective clothing and safety and protective equipment that weighs more than 70 pounds (rather than 75 pounds) or more than 35% (rather than 50%) of the firefighter's weight, whichever is less. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREFIGHTER-WEIGHT CARRY LIMIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 009-003-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 740 | 11.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-6-11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 705 | 11n | New Code | See Bill Text |