IL HB2983 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0098
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0098
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Youth Homelessness Prevention Subcommittee Act. Requires the Governor's Cabinet on Children and Youth to create the Youth Homelessness Prevention Subcommittee to drive the State's strategic vision for preventing homelessness among youth leaving State systems of care. Sets forth the Subcommittee's duties including: (1) reviewing the discharge planning, services plans, and discharge procedures for youth leaving the custody or guardianship of the Department of Children and Family Services, the Department of Juvenile Justice, the Department of Human Services' Division of Mental Health, and the Department of Corrections to determine whether such discharge planning and procedures ensure housing stability for youth leaving State systems of care; and (2) collecting data on the housing stability of youth for one year after they are released from State custody or guardianship. Provides that the Subcommittee shall include specified members, including: (i) one representative from the Governor's office; (ii) 4 representatives from agencies serving homeless youth; and (iii) 4 youth who have a lived experience with homelessness. Contains provisions concerning a quorum, administrative support, subcommittee meetings, and reporting requirements.
Title
YOUTH HOMELESSNESS PREVENTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0098 |
2019-07-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 018-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |