IL HB2992 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0494
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0494
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Business Corporation Act of 1983. Requires the Secretary of State to maintain a list of domestic and foreign corporations regulated under the Public Utilities Act, the Collateral Recovery Act, or the Personal Property Storage Act (rather than the Public Utilities Act), or specified provisions of the Illinois Vehicle Code (rather than both the Public Utilities Act and Chapter 18 of the Illinois Vehicle Code) that hold, as a prerequisite for doing business in the State, any franchise, license, permit, or right to engage in a business regulated by the Acts. Provides that each month the Secretary of State shall, by written notice, advise the Chief Clerk of the Illinois Commerce Commission of: any domestic corporation on the list that has been dissolved within the month; and any foreign corporation on the list whose authority to do business in Illinois has been revoked within the month. Provides that the Secretary of State and the Illinois Commerce Commission may provide each other with this information in an electronic format, including records of the Secretary of State that will provide the Illinois Commerce Commission the information it requires under the statutes it administers. Requires the provision of such information to begin as soon as practicable, but no later than October 1, 2020. Makes similar changes to the General Not For Profit Corporation Act of 1986, the Limited Liability Company Act, the Uniform Partnership Act (1997), and the Uniform Limited Partnership Act (2001).
Title
SOS MAINTAIN LIST NOTIFY ICC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0494 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 019-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 105 | 115.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 35-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 45-36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 206 | 1003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 215 | 809 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 215 | 906 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 5 | 15.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |