IL HB2999 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Taxpayer's Fiscal Charter Act. Provides for a discretionary spending freeze for fiscal years 2020 and 2021. Sets forth requirements to increase discretionary spending beginning in fiscal year 2022. Requires any new spending proposed by the General Assembly in addition to existing obligations shall be accompanied by a proposed source of revenue to pay for the proposed spending or specified cuts necessary to offset the proposed spending. Prohibits unfunded mandates. Requires the publishing of certain information before voting on or enacting an appropriations bill. Effective immediately.
Title
TAXPAYER FISCAL CHARTER ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2999&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2999.htm |