IL HB3025 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the School Building Rehabilitation Tax Credit Act. Creates an income tax credit equal to 25% of the qualified expenditures incurred by a qualified taxpayer undertaking a qualified rehabilitation plan of a vacant school building. Provides that, to be eligible for the credit, the taxpayer must apply with the Department of Revenue. Provides that the credit is subject to certain limitations. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SCHOOL BUILDING REHABILITATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |