IL HB3052 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the License to Work Act. Deletes language providing that all notices sent to a person involved in an administrative proceeding shall state that failure to satisfy any fine or penalty shall result in the Secretary of State suspending his or her driving privileges, vehicle registration, or both. Provides that the Secretary is authorized to cancel any license or permit if the holder failed to pay any fees owed to the Secretary for the license or permit (rather than failure to pay any fees, civil penalties owed to the Illinois Commerce Commission, or taxes due upon reasonable notice and demand). Provides that a person whose driver's license was canceled, suspended, or revoked under certain circumstances shall have his or her driving privileges reinstated. Deletes language providing that the reporting requirements for public officials shall apply to a truant minor in need of supervision, an addicted minor, or a delinquent minor whose driver's license has been suspended. Provides for the immediate revocation of the license, permit, or driving privileges of any driver if the driver was convicted of a misdemeanor relating to a motor vehicle if the person exercised actual physical control over the vehicle during the commission of the offense. Provides that the Secretary is authorized to suspend or revoke the driving privileges of any person without a preliminary hearing if the person has been convicted of criminal trespass to vehicle if the person exercised actual physical control over the vehicle during the commission of the offense. Provides that in order to be subject to suspension or revocation for violation of specific provisions of the Liquor Control Act of 1934, a person must also be an occupant of a motor vehicle at the time of the violation. Deletes language authorizing the Secretary to suspend or revoke the driving privileges of a person without a preliminary hearing for specific adjudications or violations. Deletes language providing that the owner of a registered vehicle that has failed to pay any fine or penalty due and owing as a result of 10 or more violations shall have his or her driving privileges suspended. Repeals Sections concerning the suspension of a driver's license for theft of motor fuel and suspension of driving privileges for failure to satisfy fines or penalties for toll violations or evasions. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
VEH CD-LICENSE TO WORK ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-704.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-205.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-209.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 6-306.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-306.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3052&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3052.htm |