IL HB3053 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Creates the School District Efficiency Commission. Provides for the membership and support of the Commission. Requires the Commission to make recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on the number of school districts in this State, the optimal amount of enrollment for a school district, and where reorganization and realignment of school districts would be beneficial in this State; specifies the topics on which the recommendations must focus. Provides that, on or before May 1, 2020, the Commission must vote on its recommendations and submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly. Provides that if the Commission adopts the report recommendations by an affirmative vote of at least 11 of its members, then the Commission's recommendations for reorganization of school districts into unit school districts must be placed on the ballots of the designated school districts in the next general election in the same manner as petitions approved by a regional superintendent of schools, except without financial incentives. Provides that the Commission is dissolved the day after the report is filed with the Governor and the General Assembly. Repeals the provision on February 1, 2021. Makes a conforming change in the Conversion and Formation of School Districts Article. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH DISTRICT EFFICIENCY COMM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 To |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Re-assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-02 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2019-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Tabled |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b) Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 11E-135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 11E-140 | New Code | See Bill Text |