IL HB3064 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act. Amends various Acts to restore the provisions that were amended by Public Act 100-987 to the form in which they existed before their amendment by Public Act 100-987. Effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REPEAL CRIMINAL ASSESSMENT ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseTabled
2019-04-03HouseMotion Prevailed
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseMotion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Dan Caulkins
2019-03-13HouseTo Government Process Subcommittee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2013103.2Amended CodeCitation Text
20141010Amended CodeCitation Text
2026107.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2039309.1Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.886Repealed CodeCitation Text
301056b-4Amended CodeCitation Text
301056z-105Repealed CodeCitation Text
301056z-82Amended CodeCitation Text
301056z-87Amended CodeCitation Text
301058pAmended CodeCitation Text
301058qAmended CodeCitation Text
306057cAmended CodeCitation Text
507059Amended CodeCitation Text
507059.1Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-4012Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-6023Amended CodeCitation Text
5554-2002Amended CodeCitation Text
5554-2002.1Amended CodeCitation Text
5554-2004Amended CodeCitation Text
5554-2005Amended CodeCitation Text
5554-2006Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1101Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1101.5Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1103Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-1002.5Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-501.01Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-605Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-605.1Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-605.3Amended CodeCitation Text
625515-113Amended CodeCitation Text
625516-104aAmended CodeCitation Text
625516-104bAmended CodeCitation Text
625516-104cAmended CodeCitation Text
625516-104dAmended CodeCitation Text
625516-104d-1Amended CodeCitation Text
625516-105Amended CodeCitation Text
62552-120Amended CodeCitation Text
70510527.1aAmended CodeCitation Text
70510527.1bRepealed CodeCitation Text
70510527.2Amended CodeCitation Text
70510527.2aAmended CodeCitation Text
70510527.2bAmended CodeCitation Text
70510527.3Amended CodeCitation Text
70510527.3aAmended CodeCitation Text
70510527.3b-1Repealed CodeCitation Text
70510527.3cAmended CodeCitation Text
70510527.3eAmended CodeCitation Text
70510527.3gAmended CodeCitation Text
70510527.4Amended CodeCitation Text
70510527.5Amended CodeCitation Text
70510527.6Amended CodeCitation Text
70510527.7Amended CodeCitation Text
705135ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
7054055-915Amended CodeCitation Text
7059515Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-3.4Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-30Amended CodeCitation Text
72055010.3Amended CodeCitation Text
720570411.2Amended CodeCitation Text
720570411.4Amended CodeCitation Text
72064680Amended CodeCitation Text
72064690Amended CodeCitation Text
72524010Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124A-20Repealed CodeCitation Text
73012517Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4-3Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-50Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-55Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-60Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-65Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-75Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-80Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-3Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-6Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-6-1Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-6-3Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-6-3.1Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-7-1Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.1-5Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.10Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.11Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.12Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.14Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.15Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.16Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.17Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.18Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.19Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.20Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.21Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.4Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.5Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.6Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.7Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.9Amended CodeCitation Text
73555-105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback