IL HB3082 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that if a participating employee fails to direct the investment of amounts deferred into the various investment options offered to the participant, the amounts deferred shall be invested in the Plan's default investment fund and the investment shall be deemed to have been made at the participant's investment direction. Provides that an employee automatically enrolled into the deferred compensation plan shall have 3% of his or her pre-tax gross compensation (instead of gross compensation) for each compensation period deferred into his or her deferred compensation account. Provides that an employee shall have 30 days from the start date of employment (instead of 6 months from the date of enrollment) to elect to not participate in the deferred compensation plan or to elect to increase or reduce the amount of gross compensation deferred. Provides that an employee shall be automatically enrolled in the deferred compensation plan beginning the first day of the pay period following the employee's thirtieth day of employment. Makes changes to provisions concerning withdrawal from the deferred compensation plan. Provides that an employee electing to withdraw from the deferred compensation plan shall forfeit all employer matching contributions, if any, made prior to the election. Provides that any refunded amount shall be included in the employee's gross income for the taxable year in which the refund is issued.
Title
PEN CD-DEFERRED COMPENSATION
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] |
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0277 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |