IL HB3096 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-20 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-20 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act and the Service Use Tax Act. Contains provisions concerning marketplace facilitators. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a deduction for trusts and estates for certain excess business losses. Creates an addition modification for corporations for certain foreign derived income. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Imposes a managed care organization provider assessment. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code to create a managed care organization provider assessment. Extends the amnesty period under the Tax Delinquency Amnesty Act and the Franchise Tax and License Fee Amnesty Act of 2007. Effective immediately.
Title
PTELL-REFERENDUM
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-20 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-06-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-06-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-06-01 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-06-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2019-06-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-019-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2019-03-28 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-190.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |