IL HB3105 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wrongful Tree Cutting Act. Changes the definition of "stumpage". Defines "protected land" and "qualified professional forester or ecological restoration professional". Provides that any party found to have intentionally cut or knowingly caused to be cut any standing timber or tree, other than a tree or woody plant referenced in the Illinois Exotic Weed Act, on protected land, and the party did not have the legal right to so cut or cause to be cut, must pay the person or entity that owns or holds a conservation right to the land 3 times stumpage value plus remediation costs. Provides that nothing in the Act limits the rights of a party to pursue causes of action under other laws, including any available common law remedies for damages. Limits the relief available under the Act. Provides that the court shall allow a plaintiff who prevails to recover the cost of expenses incurred. Makes changes in provisions concerning appraisals and findings of value and expenses. Adds provisions concerning: remediation plans; court-ordered determinations of costs; assistance by the Department of Natural Resources; and use of awards under the Act. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
TREE CUTTING-PROTECTED LAND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0102 |
2019-07-19 | House | Effective Date July 19, 2019 |
2019-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-03-13 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 185 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 185 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 185 | 2.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
740 | 185 | 2.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
740 | 185 | 2.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
740 | 185 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 185 | 3.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
740 | 185 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 185 | 4.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
740 | 185 | 4.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |