IL HB3129 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Removes a provision requiring the Department of Human Services to increase TANF grant amounts in effect on June 30, 2008 by 15%. Provides that TANF grant amounts shall be apportioned as follows: 75% shall be designated for the child or children of the assistance unit; and 25% shall be designated for the adult member or members of the assistance unit. Removes a provision that permits the discontinuance of all or a part of a TANF recipient's grant amount as a penalty for noncompliance with TANF education, training, and employment programs. Requires the Department to, by rule, impose a 30% reduction of the portion of the grant amount designated for the adult member or members of an assistance unit when a member is found to be in noncompliance with program requirements without good cause. Provides that no sanction shall reduce the portion of the grant amount that is designated for any child of the assistance unit. Requires the full grant amount to be restored when an adult member or members are determined to be in compliance with program requirements. Provides that homelessness, receipt of an eviction notice, discontinued utilities, and other specified circumstances shall constitute good cause for failure to participate in required TANF education, training, and employment programs. Provides that beginning October 1, 2019, and each October 1 thereafter, the maximum TANF benefit levels shall be annually adjusted to remain equal to at least 30% of the most recent poverty guidelines updated periodically in the Federal Register by the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services for each family size. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TANF-GRANT AMOUNTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0103
2019-07-19HouseEffective Date July 19, 2019
2019-07-19HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 034-015-000
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-000-000
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-04-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-09SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2019
2019-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-025-000
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 016-000-000
2019-03-15HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-03-14HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305512-4.11Amended CodeCitation Text
30554-2Amended CodeCitation Text
30554-21Amended CodeCitation Text
30559A-7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback