IL HB3143 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides a county with less than 3,000,000 inhabitants may, upon referendum approval, change the manner in which it selects its county assessor or county supervisor of assessments from an elected position to an appointed position or from an appointed position to an elected position. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SUPERVISOR ASSESSMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-26HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0150
2019-07-26HouseEffective Date July 26, 2019
2019-07-26HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateDo Pass Revenue; 008-000-000
2019-04-30SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-10HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-003-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000
2019-03-21HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2019-03-21HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2019-03-14HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
352003-5Amended CodeCitation Text
352003-52New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback