IL HB3148 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Local Volunteer Board Member Removal Act. Provides that the person or entity that appointed a member of a volunteer board or commission may remove that member for misconduct, official misconduct, or neglect of office. Provides that removal under the Act is in addition to any other method of removal provided by law. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
REMOVAL OF APPOINTED OFFICIALS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |