IL HB3151 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Removes sunset date of December 31, 2020 for the provision creating the Illinois Sentencing Policy Advisory Council. Adds the Cook County Sheriff, or his or her designee as an ex-officio member of the Council. Provides that the Council shall determine the qualifications for and hire the Executive Director. Effective immediately.
Title
IL SENTENCE POL COUNCIL-EXTEND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0279 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-001-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-03-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-8-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |