IL HB3189 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits the offense of unlawful use of weapons when he or she knowingly possesses, sells or offers to sell, purchases, manufactures, imports, transfers, or uses: (1) any manual, power-driven, or electronic device that is designed to and functions to increase the rate of fire of a semiautomatic firearm when the device is attached to the firearm; (2) any part of a semiautomatic firearm or combination of parts that is designed to and functions to increase the rate of fire of a semiautomatic firearm by eliminating the need for the operator of the firearm to make a separate movement for each individual function of the trigger; or (3) any other device, part, or combination of parts that is designed to and functions to substantially increase the rate of fire of a semiautomatic firearm above the standard rate of fire for semiautomatic firearms that is not equipped with that device, part, or combination of parts. This offense is a Class 2 felony. Provides for exemptions.
Title
CRIM CD-DEVICES-RATE OF FIRE
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] |
Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-08-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-08-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3189&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3189.htm |