IL HB3191 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that in a proceeding for the prosecution of an offense of criminal sexual assault, predatory criminal sexual assault of a child, aggravated criminal sexual assault, criminal sexual abuse, or aggravated criminal sexual abuse the court on a motion by the prosecuting attorney, may order that the defendant question the victim through a court-appointed attorney if the defendant has waived his or her right to counsel and is representing himself or herself pro se, when the victim's testimony will describe an act or attempted act of sexual conduct, and the court finds that requiring the victim to be questioned directly by the defendant will cause the victim to suffer serious emotional or mental distress. Provides that the defendant shall be allowed to communicate with the court-appointed attorney.
Title
CRIM PRO-SEXUAL ABUSE VICTIMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-05-02 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-001 |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor |